U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01173
  • Case Name: Ortiz Salgado v. University of Connecticut Health Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2022: [Bond]
  • November 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Security for Costs]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Security for Costs]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.