U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01170
  • Case Name: McGeachy v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • November 03, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 03, 2022: [Social Security Transcripts]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of New SSA Action]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.