U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01183
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Twin Oaks Software Development Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.