U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01177
  • Case Name: Cutrone et al v. Milford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 07, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2022
  • November 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.