U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01163
  • Case Name: Ibbison v. Quiros et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 09, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.