U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01180
  • Case Name: Fontana et al v. Grove School, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • December 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2022: [More Definite Statement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 14, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice 83.1]
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.