U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 13, 2022: [Bond]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • September 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.