U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01224
  • Case Name: Dunn v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 30, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Social Security Transcripts]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of New SSA Action]
  • September 30, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • September 30, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.