U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01225
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Kohler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 11, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 04, 2022: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • October 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 29, 2022: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.