U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01334
  • Case Name: Dennis v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Social Security Transcripts]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of New SSA Action]
  • October 25, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 25, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order re: Filing Fee]
  • October 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.