U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01414
  • Case Name: Abbott v. International Exposition Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 08, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.