U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01447
  • Case Name: Rivas-Plata v. Baptista et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Response]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice 83.1]
  • November 15, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • November 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.