U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Voir Dire Begun]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Jury Selection]
  • April 23, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Application for Writ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 03, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 01, 2025: [Trial Memo]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 23, 2025: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 15, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • November 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.