U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosario-Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 23, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Trial Memo]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [PS Violation Report No Action]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 18, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 02, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • December 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.