U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01581
  • Case Name: In re: Kwok
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Objection]
  • December 27, 2022: [Bankruptcy Designation Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Leave to Appeal]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice 83.1]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bankruptcy Designation Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bankruptcy Transmittal Form]
  • December 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.