U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01014
  • Case Name: Gutama Morales v. Avila et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: [Consent and Transfer to Jurisdiction by USMJ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 18, 2025: [Settlement]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.