U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01453
  • Case Name: Calhoun v. Uconn Health et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Objection]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • May 05, 2025: [Clarification]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 29, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Compel]
February, 2025
  • February 08, 2025: [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Letter]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.