U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01579
  • Case Name: This, LLC v. HolaBelle, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response]
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: [Seal]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Response]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.