U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01448
  • Case Name: Pawlowski v. Easter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Case to PJO]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.