U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Rothermel v. Silo Hill Condominium Association, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 10, 2024: [Strike]
  • October 01, 2024: [Update Answer Deadline]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.