U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01359
  • Case Name: Reed v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [USM Service Papers Sent - Prisoner]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Reopening Case]
  • October 01, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Dismissing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.