U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00989
  • Case Name: Wang v. Quiros et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Take Deposition]
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [USM Service Papers Sent - Prisoner]
  • April 22, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
October, 2024
  • October 12, 2024: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [ExParte Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.