U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01533
  • Case Name: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Third Floor Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 09, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2024: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.