U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00680
  • Case Name: Guardian Flight LLC et al v. AETNA Life Insurance Company Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response]
  • March 26, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 13, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.