U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00284
  • Case Name: In re: Kwok
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Bankruptcy Briefing Notice]
  • September 30, 2024: [Bankruptcy Transmittal Form]
  • September 30, 2024: [Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record]
  • September 27, 2024: [Bankruptcy Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.