U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01553
  • Case Name: Cornish v. Town of Bloomfield et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response]
  • May 04, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Clarification]
  • April 10, 2025: [Clarification]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 08, 2025: [Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Take Deposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 15, 2025: [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2024
  • November 10, 2024: [Sanctions]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 10, 2024: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Objection]
  • September 27, 2024: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.