U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00654
  • Case Name: Shaw v. Washington et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.