U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bidone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2025: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2024: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.