U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01052
  • Case Name: Malon v. Koskinas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response]
  • May 13, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.