U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01319
  • Case Name: Ratches v. Guerrera et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 01, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner]
  • March 14, 2025: [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.