U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Alvarado v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 28, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.