U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00984
  • Case Name: Umrani v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 01, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.