U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01562
  • Case Name: USA v. New England Greens, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Deposit Received]
  • April 28, 2025: [Funds Invested]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Deposit Funds]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Order re: Letters]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.