U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01205
  • Case Name: Town of Westport v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.