U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01328
  • Case Name: Englund v. HPS, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 09, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.