U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01439
  • Case Name: Beyond the Dog, LLC v. Salzer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2025: [Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 09, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 09, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 26, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: [Exhibit]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.