U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01101
  • Case Name: Uniformed Professional Fire Fighters Association of Connecticut et al v. 3M Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 09, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Stay]
  • October 04, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 04, 2024: [Stay]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Response]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Stay]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.