U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-01242
  • Case Name: Post University Inc v. Learneo, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Additional Authority]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Additional Authority]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Seal]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.