U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00640
  • Case Name: In re: Nash Engineering Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.