U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01565
  • Case Name: Decormier v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 11, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice Regarding Service]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Order re: Letters]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2024: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order re: Filing Fee]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.