U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01511
  • Case Name: Foster v. Manpower US, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.