U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01564
  • Case Name: Lal Dagami Magar et al v. Tika Indian Restaurant LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 11, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Order for FLSA cases]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.