U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01469
  • Case Name: Palacios v. Ashley Global Retail, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Response]
  • October 03, 2024: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.