U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01568
  • Case Name: Szabo v. Caraluzzis Georgetown Food Market, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.