U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01492
  • Case Name: Speer v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.