U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01506
  • Case Name: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • March 13, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [SSA Cases - Standing Order re: Assignment]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Appearance - Commissioner]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.