U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Tahbaz et al v. Vigilant Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.