U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manoo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.