U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00265
  • Case Name: Sharpe v. Sharpe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Recommended Ruling]
  • May 05, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Recommended Ruling]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.