U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Hoff et al v. Avco Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 14, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 14, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Response]
  • October 08, 2024: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.